GA HB864 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to taxes on tobacco products, so as to provide for excise taxes to be levied on the sale of vapor devices and consumable vapor products; to provide for the collection and remittance of such taxes; to require licensure for persons dealing with vapor devices or consumable vapor products and to provide for application and renewal of such licenses; to provide for appeals of certain decisions made by the state revenue commissioner; to provide for civil and criminal penalties; to provide for rules and regulations; to revise and provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Excise tax; sale of vapor devices and consumable vapor products; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #617 (Y: 70 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #618 (Y: 78 N: 77 NV: 7 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #619 (Y: 83 N: 73 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #618 (Y: 78 N: 77 NV: 7 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #619 (Y: 83 N: 73 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Tabled |
2020-03-12 | House | House Reconsidered |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House Hopper |