GA HB886 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 11 of Title 4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding animal protection, so as to require veterinarians or veterinary technicians that provide treatment to animals to scan such animals' microchips and to report ownership information under certain circumstances; to allow such professionals to appear and testify regarding the ownership and treatment of such animals; to provide such professionals with immunity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Animals; veterinarians or veterinary technicians that provide treatment to animals to scan such animals' microchips and to report ownership information under certain circumstances; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #609 (Y: 147 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-04 | House | House Hopper |