GA HB900 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the election of members of the Board of Education of Lamar County, approved March 31, 1971 (Ga. L. 1971, p. 2710), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 4000), so as to revise the rate and form of compensation of the members and chairperson of the Board of Education of Lamar County; to provide for a reduction in compensation for meetings or work sessions not attended; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lamar County; Board of Education; revise compensation of members and chairperson
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #603 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #625 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #625 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 390 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Postponed |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hopper |