GA HB930 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 80 of Title 36, Title 48, and Chapter 32 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to provisions applicable to counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities, revenue and taxation, and the Georgia Regional Transportation Authority; to amend Chapter 9 of Title 32 of the O.C.G.A., relating to mass transportation, so as to provide for a new article; to create a special district in Cobb County for purposes of entering a rapid transit contract with the authority; to repeal Code Section 36-1-27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to referendum approval required prior to expenditure of public funds for establishment of fixed guideway transit; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Regional Transportation Authority; creation of certain community improvement districts; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] |
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Meagan Hanson [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #879 (Y: 155 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #819 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #669 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #597 (Y: 162 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #819 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #669 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #597 (Y: 162 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 409 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 21st, 51st, 26th |
2018-03-23 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 9th, 47th, 135th |
2018-03-23 | House | House Insisted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2018-03-23 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House Hopper |