GA HB935 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from ad valorem tax, so as to add certain fulfillment centers to properties eligible for a freeport exemption; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; properties eligible for a freeport exemption; add certain fulfillment centers
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #724 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #668 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #668 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 539 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-08 | House | House Hopper |