GA HB950 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 437
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 437
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the assessment and collection of a technology fee by the Probate Court of Douglas County; to identify the authorized uses of such technology fee; to provide for the termination of such technology fee and dedication of residual funds to technology uses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Douglas County; Probate Court; authorize assessment and collection of a technology fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #476 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #414 (Y: 96 N: 71 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #414 (Y: 96 N: 71 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Act 437 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-01-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-22 | House | House Hopper |