GA HB961 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a new charter for the City of Maysville; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for a governing authority of such city and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, vacancies, compensation, expenses, qualifications, prohibitions, conflicts of interest, and suspension and removal from office relative to members of such governing authority; to provide for inquiries and investigations; to provide for a mayor and mayor tempore and certain duties, powers, and other matters relative thereto; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Maysville, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #554 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - House - House Vote #555 - Local Calendar (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - House - House Vote #555 - Local Calendar (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 593 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-08 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-05 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-27 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-26 | House First Readers |