GA HB964 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal an Act providing for a nonstaggered four-month vehicle registration period for McIntosh County, approved April 4, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 3861); to specify the vehicle registration period for McIntosh County; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
McIntosh County; vehicle registration period; repeal
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Lane [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #634 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - House - House Vote #555 - Local Calendar (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - House - House Vote #555 - Local Calendar (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 592 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-08 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-02-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-05 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-27 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-26 | House First Readers |