GA HB966 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to forest resources and other plant life, so as to regulate the harvest and sale of palmetto berries; to provide for definitions; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for certificates of harvest; to provide for records of harvest activities and purchase transactions; to provide for prohibited acts; to provide for stop sale, stop use, and removal orders; to provide for seizure of berries; to provide for home or personal use of berries; to provide for penalties and restitution; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Conservation and natural resources; regulate the harvest and sale of palmetto berries
Sponsors
Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #756 (Y: 140 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #661 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #516 (Y: 125 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #661 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #516 (Y: 125 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 571 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hopper |