GA HB971 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income taxes, so as to provide for a tax credit for certain eligible expenses incurred for firearm safe handling instructional courses and firearm secure storage devices; to provide for an aggregate annual cap; to provide for definitions; to provide for terms and conditions; to provide for credit preapproval by the department; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for a short title; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Firearm Safe Handling and Secure Storage Tax Credit Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Scott Hilton [R] | Rep. Matt Reeves [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 101, Hb 946, Hb 581, Hr 1022, Hb 264, Hb 974, Hb 976, Hb 977, Hb 1021, Hb 1207, Hb 814, Hb 82, Hb 971, Hb 1182, Hr 804, Hr 96: Senate Vote #763 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #582 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #582 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-21 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-22 | House | House Hopper |