GA HB98 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to provide conditions for meetings and public hearings to be held by teleconference in emergency conditions; to provide conditions for certain agency members to participate in nonemergency meetings by teleconference; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; conditions for meetings and public hearings to be held by teleconference in emergency conditions; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #367 (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 23 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #284 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #67 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #284 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #67 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 171 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House Hopper |