GA HB991 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act changing the method of electing the members of the Board of Education of Putnam County, approved March 27, 1972 (Ga. L. 1972, p. 2678), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 27, 1995 (Ga. L. 1995, p. 3722), so as to change the compensation of such members; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Putnam County; Board of Education; change compensation of members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #603 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #677 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #677 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 499 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Hopper |