GA HB992 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed 50th, 56th, 11th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed 50th, 56th, 11th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to emergency medical services, so as to eliminate certain requirements relating to the use of automated external defibrillators; to eliminate obsolete language relating to base station facilities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; use of automated external defibrillators; eliminate certain requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #714 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #640 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #640 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 50th, 56th, 11th |
2018-03-29 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 122nd, 11th, 116th |
2018-03-29 | House | House Insisted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2018-03-29 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Hopper |