GA HR1162 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution of Georgia so as to clarify the authority of the state to establish state-wide education policy; to restate the authority of the General Assembly to create special schools; to delineate types of schools that the General Assembly may authorize and clarify funding authority; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; state-wide education policy; clarify authority - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] |
Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Alisha Morgan [D] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #646 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #645 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 55th (Y: 18 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #644 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 41st (Y: 18 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - House Vote #518 - Adopt (Y: 123 N: 48 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Vote #477 - Recon (Y: 114 N: 49 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Vote #474 - Adopt (Y: 110 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #645 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 55th (Y: 18 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #644 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 41st (Y: 18 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - House Vote #518 - Adopt (Y: 123 N: 48 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Vote #477 - Recon (Y: 114 N: 49 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Vote #474 - Adopt (Y: 110 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-03 | Act 762 | |
2012-05-03 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-22 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2012-02-22 | House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Res | |
2012-02-09 | House Reconsidered | |
2012-02-08 | House Notice To Reconsider | |
2012-02-08 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2012-02-08 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-07 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-07 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-25 | House First Readers |