GA HR1317 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Reforming Real Property Taxation; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Reforming Real Property Taxation; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #779 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53240 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/174782 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53240#16174 |