GA HR256 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring the life of Ms. Sophia Ruth Fisher and dedicating an interchange in her memory; and for other purposes.
Title
Sophia Ruth Fisher Interchange; Tift County; dedicate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute: Senate Vote #371 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #342 (Y: 175 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #313 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Adopt: House Vote #167 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #342 (Y: 175 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #313 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Adopt: House Vote #167 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 73 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-21 | House | House Hopper |