GA HR38 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Historically Black Colleges and Universities and Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) Fields; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Historically Black Colleges and Universities and Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics (STEM) Fields; create
Sponsors
Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Renitta Shannon [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] |
Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-17 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-16 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54257 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/179570 |