GA HR533 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Innovative Financial Options for Senior Living; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Innovative Financial Options for Senior Living; create
Sponsors
Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] |
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #317 (Y: 171 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House Hopper |