GA HR744 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - House Passed/Adopted As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - House Passed/Adopted As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging the Georgia Occupational Regulatory Review Council to perform periodic reviews of existing regulatory entities; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Occupational Regulatory Review Council; perform periodic reviews of existing regulatory entities; encourage
Sponsors
Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] |
Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. Robert Gasaway [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Vote #531 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2018-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-28 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Hopper |