GA SB127 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective Date 2023-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective Date 2023-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to excise tax on rooms, lodgings, and accommodations, so as to provide procedures for certain local governments to change the designated private sector nonprofit organization engaged to promote tourism, conventions, and trade shows for such jurisdiction; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Excise Tax; procedures for certain local governments to change the designated private sector nonprofit organization; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #320 (Y: 161 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #163 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #163 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Effective Date 2023-04-25 | |
2023-04-25 | Act 24 | |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |