GA SB158 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide certain consumer and provider protections regarding health insurance; to provide for definitions; to provide for short titles; to provide for health insurer transparency; to provide for health care providers' right to choose; to provide for health care provider stability; to provide for consumer right to access; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Consumer and Provider Protection Act"; provide certain consumer and provider protections regarding health insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #773 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #453 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #453 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 407 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Postponed |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |