GA SB159 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding correctional institutions of states and counties, so as to prohibit wireless communications and stand-alone electronic devices behind guard lines; to provide for penalties; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Correctional Institutions of States and Counties; wireless communications and stand-alone electronic devices behind guard lines; prohibit
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - Recede From Senate's Disagreement And Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #415 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #301 (Y: 103 N: 72 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #88 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 14th: Senate Vote #87 (Y: 22 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #301 (Y: 103 N: 72 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #88 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 14th: Senate Vote #87 (Y: 22 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Receded from Amend or Sub |
2024-01-08 | House | House Insisted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |