GA SB16 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to physicians, assistants, and others, so as to enter into an interstate compact known as the "Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Act"; to authorize the Georgia Composite Medical Board to administer the compact in this state; to require fingerprint records checks; to provide for application of an expedited license; to provide for a coordinated information system; to provide for joint investigations and discipline; to provide for a commission to administer the compact among the member states; to provide for dispute resolution; to provide for withdrawal from the compact; to provide for construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Act"
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Vote #238 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #21 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #21 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-25 | Act 46 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |