GA SB162 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to health, so as to eliminate certificate of need requirements for all health care facilities except certain long-term care facilities and services; to amend Code Section 50-18-70 of the O.C.G.A., relating to legislative intent and definitions relative to open records laws, so as to revise definitions; to amend other provisions in various titles of the O.C.G.A., for purposes of conformity; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; certificate of need requirements for all health care facilities except certain long-term care facilities and services; eliminate
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] |
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |