GA SB164 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-11-471, Title 16, and Code Section 31-22-9.1 of the O.C.G.A., relating to definitions relative to juvenile delinquency, crimes and offenses, and who may perform HIV tests, respectively, so as to provide for the modernization of HIV related laws to align with science to ensure that laws and policies support current understanding of best public health practices for preventing and treating HIV, scientific evidence about routes of transmission, and the public health goals of promoting HIV prevention and treatment; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
HIV Tests; modernization of HIV related laws to align with science; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Recede: House Vote #846 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #416 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #175 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #416 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #175 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-09 | Act 845 | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | House Receded from Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-29 | House | House Postponed |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |