GA SB166 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 26 of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to nurses, so as to enter into an interstate compact known as the "Nurse Licensure Compact"; to authorize the Georgia Board of Nursing to exercise certain powers with respect to the compact; to provide for general provisions and jurisdiction; to provide for a coordinated licensure information system and exchange of information between the party states; to provide for the establishment of the Interstate Commission of Nurse Licensure Compact Administrators; to provide for oversight, dispute resolution, and enforcement; to provide for an effective date, withdrawal, and amendment of the compact; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Nurse Licensure Compact"; Georgia Board of Nursing exercise certain powers with respect to compact; authorize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #103 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-21 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |