GA SB18 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 4 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to technical and adult education, so as to provide that the Technical College System of Georgia shall establish policies for granting academic credit to students for college level learning acquired prior to enrollment from military service, work experience, service in the community, or independent study; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Technical College System of Georgia; establish policies for granting academic credit for college level learning from military service, work experience
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Gail Davenport [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Vincent Fort [D] |
Sen. Donzella James [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #809 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #784 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #31 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #784 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #31 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 610 | |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2016-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |