GA SB183 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state administration and enforcement of revenue and taxation, so as to provide that each person that files or is required to file Form 1099-K with the Internal Revenue Service shall also electronically file a copy of each such form to the state revenue commissioner on or before the federal deadline; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and Taxation; each person that files FORM 1099-K with the Internal Revenue Service shall also file electronically to the state revenue commissioner on or before federal deadline; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #328 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #284 (Y: 144 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #107 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #126 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #284 (Y: 144 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #107 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #126 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 280 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |