GA SB195 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 26 and Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to food, drugs, and cosmetics and to professions and businesses, respectively, so as to clarify that the applications submitted for certain professions and businesses are to be made in the form prescribed and not necessarily as a written document; to change provisions relating to examinations to obtain a license to engage in the practice of pharmacy; to change certain provisions relating to the general powers of the division director; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions/Businesses; clarify applications submitted in prescribed form not necessarily written document; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #932 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #401 - Pass (Y: 131 N: 27 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #194 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #401 - Pass (Y: 131 N: 27 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #194 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 417 | |
2010-05-20 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Insists | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2009-04-01 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-17 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-24 | Senate Read and Referred |