GA SB211 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Veto V12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Veto V12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the general authority, duties, and procedure for state purchasing, so as to exempt certain purchases from having to go through the Department of Administrative Services; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Purchasing; exempt certain purchases from having to go through Dept. of Administrative Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - House - House Vote #382 - Pass (Y: 144 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #195 - Passage (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #195 - Passage (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Veto V12 | |
2009-05-11 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-17 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Read and Referred |