GA SB230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the City of Tucker Public Facilities Authority and to provide for the appointment of members of the authority; to confer powers upon the authority; to provide for purpose and scope of operations of the authority; to provide for definitions; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority; to fix and provide the venue and jurisdiction of actions relating to any provisions of this Act; to provide for monies received and trust funds; to provide for tort immunity; to provide for tax exemption, rates, charges, and revenues; to provide for effect on other governments; to provide for construction of act and severability; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"City of Tucker Public Facilities Authority Act"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #329 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 197 | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |