GA SB249 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Act 551
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Act 551
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 17 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund, so as to increase the amount of monthly dues paid by members of the fund; to revise amounts collected from certain fines and forfeitures in criminal and quasi-criminal cases; to increase the monthly benefit allowed upon retirement; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund; amount of monthly dues paid; increase; amounts collected from fines; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - House - House Vote #688 (Y: 97 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #541 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #541 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Act 551 | |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-20 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-19 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-18 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |