GA SB262 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, so as to change provisions relating to when a judge, judicial officer, grand juror, or trial juror may be disqualified from presiding or serving, as applicable, due to being related by consanguinity or affinity to a party; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; when a judge, judicial officer, grand juror; may be disqualified by being related by consanguinity/affinity to a party; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #788 (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #744 (Y: 162 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #447 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #744 (Y: 162 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #447 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 369 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |