GA SB276 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to other state symbols, so as to provide that Georgia shall be a "Purple Heart State"; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Government; provide that Georgia shall be a"Purple Heart State"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #769 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #786 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #540 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #786 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #540 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-26 | Act 630 | |
2014-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |