GA SB303 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to provide for greater transparency of prices for nonemergency health care services; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for the disclosure of certain pricing information through insurer websites to allow consumers to compare prices; to provide that insurers may use third parties to comply with such requirements; to provide for certain notice requirements; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

'Georgia Right to Shop Act'; greater transparency of prices for nonemergency healthcare services; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #674 (Y: 128 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #487 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2020-08-04 Act 567
2020-08-04SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-22SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2020-06-19HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-19HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-02-25SenateSenate Third Read
2020-02-18SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-01-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-01-16SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback