GA SB304 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 35-3-34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to disclosure and dissemination of criminal records to private persons and businesses, resulting responsibility and liability of issuing center, and provision of certain information to the FBI in conjunction with the National Instant Criminal Background Check System, so as to allow for the preservation of a person's involuntary hospitalization information received by the Georgia Crime Information Center; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal Records; allow for the preservation of a person's involuntary hospitalization information received by Georgia Crime Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Vote #905 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #837 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #793 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #547 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #558 (Y: 48 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #837 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #793 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #547 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #558 (Y: 48 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 338 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2016-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |