GA SB305 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of fire and other hazards to persons and property generally, so as to provide that written notification and an opportunity to remedy be given prior to the denial of a permit or request for a certificate of occupancy or certificate of completion or the issuance of a stop-work order with regard to buildings or structures required to meet the state minimum fire safety standards; to provide for definitions; to provide for an exception; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fire Protection and Safety; written notification prior to the denial of a permit; buildings/structures required to meet the state minimum fire safety standards
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Sen. John Crosby [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #735 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #447 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #447 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 556 | |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |