GA SB305 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to health, so as to require the department to provide certain notification prior to modification of the Physician Orders for Life-Sustaining Treatment form; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; Physician Orders for Life-Sustaining Treatment form; require department to provide certain notification prior to modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House Vote #727 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #461 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #461 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 570 | |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |