GA SB316 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-12-60 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to rules and regulations relative to bingo, so as to remove the daily permissible prize limitation while preserving the weekly permissible prize limitation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bingo; remove the daily permissible prize limitation while preserving the weekly permissible prize limitation
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #753 (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #742 (Y: 161 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #477 (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Vote #742 (Y: 161 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #477 (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 376 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |