GA SB324 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-50-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to the practice of veterinary medicine, so as to clarify a certain definition; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Veterinary Medicine; clarify a certain definition
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. George Hooks [D] | Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #843 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #755 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #493 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #755 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #493 - Passage (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 633 | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-24 | Senate Read and Referred |