GA SB331 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 445
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 445
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the Georgia Lottery for Education Act, so as to allow a winner of a lottery prize to remain anonymous under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Lottery for Education Act; winner of lottery prize to remain anonymous under certain conditions; allow
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #800 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #726 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #418 (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #726 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #418 (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Act 445 | |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |