GA SB345 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - House Reconsidered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - House Reconsidered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-6-186 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to racing on highways or streets, so as to allow races on county or municipal roads when the race is sanctioned by the local governing authority and the road is closed to other traffic; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Rules of the Road; allow races on county/municipal roads when sanctioned by the local governing authority/ road is closed to traffic
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Butterworth [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Dan Moody [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Eugene Pearson [R] | Sen. Preston Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #894 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #555 - Passage As Amended (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #555 - Passage As Amended (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | House Reconsidered | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-17 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Read and Referred |