GA SB345 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding state government, so as to prohibit state and local governments from mandating vaccine passports; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Government; state and local governments from mandating vaccine passports; prohibit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #828 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #798 (Y: 99 N: 67 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #797 (Y: 99 N: 67 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Motion For Reconsideration: Senate Vote #593 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #586 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #798 (Y: 99 N: 67 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #797 (Y: 99 N: 67 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Motion For Reconsideration: Senate Vote #593 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #586 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-03 | Act 819 | |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-03-29 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Notice to Reconsider |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |