GA SB346 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-16-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to the "Environmental Policy Act," so as to exempt projects for the construction or improvement of public roads from environmental effects reports in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Environmental Policy Act"; exempt projects for construction/improvement of public roads from environmental effects reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #778 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #791 (Y: 146 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #547 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #552 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #791 (Y: 146 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #547 (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #552 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 339 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |