GA SB347 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for extensive changes to the captive insurance company provisions of this title; to provide for definitions for types of captive insurance companies; to provide for creation and regulation of different types of captive insurance companies; to provide for certain exemptions; to change certain requirements; to provide for regulation by the Commissioner; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Georgia Captive Insurance Company Act'; provide extensive changes; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #791 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #734 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #509 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #734 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #509 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 611 | |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |