GA SB359 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Stockbridge, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4359), as amended, so as to terminate the employment of appointed officers upon such persons qualifying to seek public office; to provide for the termination of employees upon qualifying to seek public office in certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Stockbridge; terminate the employment of appointed officers upon such persons qualifying to seek public office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House Vote #721 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #484 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #484 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 389 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |