GA SB367 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for comprehensive reform for offenders entering, proceeding through, and leaving the criminal justice system so as to promote an offender's successful reentry into society, benefit the public, and enact reforms recommended by the Georgia Council on Criminal Justice Reform; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Council Justice Reform; provide for comprehensive reform
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #768 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Vote #772 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #496 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Vote #772 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #496 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-27 | Act 460 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |