GA SB374 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Conference Committee Appointed 102nd, 121st, 146th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Conference Committee Appointed 102nd, 121st, 146th
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 61 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, the "Urban Redevelopment Law," so as to revise terminology from "slums" to "pockets of blight"; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Urban Redevelopment Law"; revise terminology from "slums" to "pockets of blight"
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] |
Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #790 (Y: 167 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #520 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #520 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 102nd, 121st, 146th |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 54th, 3rd, 46th |
2014-03-20 | House | House Insists |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |