GA SB381 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 448
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 448
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to surplus line insurance, so as to provide that a nonadmitted insurer domiciled in this state will be deemed a domestic surplus lines insurer if certain criteria are met; to provide a definition; to provide for criteria; to provide for tax assessment; to provide for certain protection exceptions; to provide for financial and solvency requirements; to provide for exemptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Surplus Line Insurance; nonadmitted insurer domiciled in this state will be deemed a domestic surplus lines insurer if certain criteria are met; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Michael Williams [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] |
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #709 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #478 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #478 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Act 448 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |