GA SB385 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 358
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 358
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-8-39 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to cost reimbursement fees and surcharges, so as to change the surcharge imposed by host local governments regarding solid waste disposal facilities operated by private enterprises; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Solid Waste Disposal Facilities; surcharge imposed by host local governments; change
Sponsors
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. David Lucas [D] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Michael Williams [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #826 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #790 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #563 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #790 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #563 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 358 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Receded from Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | House | House Insisted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |